This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 08:34:15 (UTC).

Jorge A. Pineda and Sandra J. Dimatteo

Case Summary

On 11/12/2014 Jorge A Pineda and Sandra J Dimatteo was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2435

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge A Pineda

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Pineda, Jorge A

Defendant

Sandra J Dimatteo

Respondent

Dimatteo, Sandra J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Pineda, Jorge A; Dimatteo, Sandra J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: and Final

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2016
  • Notice - Comment: acknowlegement of receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -P 11-12-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Denied Fee Waiver Paid in Full - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Denied Fee Waiver Paid in Full Decision = M Closed = 11/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (P) fw denied needs to pay $435.00 Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 11/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 11-12-14 to 11-14-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 11/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less