This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 02:46:57 (UTC).

Johnny Chan and Ada Lam

Case Summary

On 05/23/2014 Johnny Chan and Ada Lam was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2579

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Johnny Chan

Chan, Johnny

Defendants and Respondents

Ada Lam

Lam, Ada

Minors

Chan, Caden

Caden Chan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: Of Termination of Temporary Judge Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Text = appoint temp judge for judicially supervised settlement conference and execution of judgment Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 09/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Text = r Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Text = response-marriage/domestic partnership & dccjea(p) Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Ada Lam,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 09/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Cancelled set for e-review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Cancelled Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Cancelled Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 11/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: FTA at Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:FTA at Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: FTA at Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:FTA at Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 82; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Johnny Chan,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2014

    Read MoreRead Less