Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:40:14 (UTC).

John Pierce vs Tatiana Pierce

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 John Pierce filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Tatiana Pierce. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2977

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pierce, John Richard

Respondent

Pierce, Tatiana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Austin, Derek Lane

Respondent Attorney

Hubbell, Karen Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Hubbell 1/30 by agreement.-lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Comment: SOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Loren Vaccarezza

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Hubbell 1/16 by agreement.-lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: S&O re S/S, A/F, sale of property f. 12/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: reg atty fees and sale of real property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Notice: Reassignment of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Comment: **$30 COURT REPORTER FEE MUST BE PAID PRIOR TO THE COURT HEARING. ** (P) s/s, atty fees & costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr's community prop dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr's separate prop dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less