This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 19:31:39 (UTC).

Martinez v. Intuitive Surgical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2016 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Intuitive Surgical, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Kirwan, Peter and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2990

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Kirwan, Peter

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Johana

Defendants

Intuitive Surgical, Inc.

Meshesha, Abiy, MD

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robins, Bill, III

Kelly, Stephen James

Greenberg, Anna

Defendant Attorneys

Jager, Marilyn Muir

McQueen, Carolyn Taylor

Firstenberg, Karen Michelle

Powell, Holiday Dreessen

Morrison, Norman Donald, IV

Canepa, Mark Bartolomeo

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice CMC 11-1-19 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 11/1/19 at 10am in D5

Minute Order

Minutes Non-Criminal:

Statement: Case Management Conference

Martinez - Joint Case Management Statement.pdf: Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Continue CMC: Comment: Stipulation to Continue CMC

Statement

Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 1 of 4): Comment: HRG 5/31/19 Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 1 of 4)

Separate Statement

Separate Statement HRG 5-31-19: Comment: HRG 5/31/19 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum: Points and Authorities

Memorandum Points and Authorities HRG 5-31-19: Comment: HRG 5/31/19 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion: Summary Judgment

Motion Summary Judgment HRG 5-31-19: Comment: HRG 5/31/19 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

Statement

Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 4 of 4): Comment: HRG 5/31/19 Statement of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 4 of 4)

Other

Other: Comment: Motion to strike (Mark Canepa) 6-7-16 9am D-3

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service Mail: Comment: served answer and civil case cover sheet

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: to complaint Atty Ruby

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons Issued Filed:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: (11th CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC 11-1-19 at 10am in D5: Comment: CMC set for 11/1/19 at 10am in D5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Conference: Case Management - Stipulation to Continue CMC: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (10th CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Martinez - Joint Case Management Statement.pdf: Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 2 weeks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Conference: Trial Management - Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 4 of 4): Motion Summary Judgment HRG 5-31-19: Memorandum Points and Authorities HRG 5-31-19: Separate Statement HRG 5-31-19: Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 1 of 4): Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 3 of 4): Statement of Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Part 2 of 4): Judicial Officer: Kuhnle, Thomas; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion by Defendant ABIY MESHESHA, M.D. for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Notice CMC reset from 5-31-19 to 8-2-19: Comment: CMC reset from 5/31/19 to 8/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Continuing CMC from 5-31-19 to 8-2-19: Comment: Order Continuing CMC from 5/31/19 to 8/2/19 - signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Other - Other: Comment: Motion to strike (Mark Canepa) 6-7-16 9am D-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Comment: 7, 10, 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Proof of Service Mail: Comment: served answer and civil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: to complaint Atty Ruby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service Summons DLR (Civil):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Summons Issued Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less