This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:52:52 (UTC).

JOE ARKOUSSIAN vs IVAN COHEN et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 JOE ARKOUSSIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IVAN COHEN. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6100

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARKOUSSIAN, JOE

Defendants

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.

COHEN, IVAN

LEAN MEALS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herns, Daniel Gary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Notice - Comment: to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Breach of Contract, Unlimited (06)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: SUMMONS (Summons)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less