This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 17:20:38 (UTC).

Jocelyn Kizine et al vs 7-Eleven Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Jocelyn Kizine filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7-Eleven Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Mikkelsen, Laurie and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6573

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kizine, Jocelyn P.

KIZINE, JOCELYN P

Defendants

7-Eleven Distribution Company

7-Eleven Inc.

7-Eleven, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopp, Andrew James

Defendant Attorney

Roe, Charles R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Kizine, Jocelyn P.; 7-Eleven Inc.; 7-Eleven Distribution Company; KIZINE, JOCELYN P; 7-Eleven, Inc.; 7-Eleven Distribution Company; Comment: with prejudice by atty Kopp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal - Comment: with prejudice by atty Kopp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSubstitution: Attorney - Comment: old atty: pro se, new atty: Andrew Kopp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: RE: Substitution of Attorney - As of February 13, 2018, all filings submitted by attorneys must be submitted electronically. Visit www.scscourt.org for details.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDemand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Roe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150.00 jury fee deposited for Defendants paid for by Atty Roe.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-ELEVEN DISTRIBUTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where 7-ELEVEN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROE, CHARLES R.