This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:12 (UTC).

Joanne Meninger vs Karl Meninger

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Joanne Meninger filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Karl Meninger. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lie, Cynthia C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lie, Cynthia C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Meninger, Joanne Marie

Respondent

Meninger, Karl Richard

Minor

Meninger, Francesca Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lie, Cynthia C; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Meninger, Joanne Marie; Meninger, Karl Richard; Meninger, Francesca Elizabeth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Set by agreement at SOC. slr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Per SOC on 7/19 by agreement-MV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Joanne 6/27 by agreement-MV Joanne 7/11 by agreement-MV

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Response/ Decl. UCCJEA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: (R) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: (R) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less