This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 18:05:31 (UTC).

Joann Kitchin as the Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Michael Kitchin, v. Cisco Systems, INC., CBRE Group, INC., Johnson Controls, INC., Jons Lang Lasalle, INC., Johnson controls Fire Proection, LP and Does Five through One Hundred

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Joann Kitchin as the Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Michael Kitchin filed an Other lawsuit against Cisco Systems, INC , CBRE Group, INC , Johnson Controls, INC , Jons Lang Lasalle, INC , Johnson controls Fire Proection, LP and Does Five through One Hundred. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3585

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOANN KITCHIN as the Successor-In-Interest to the ESTATE OF MICHAEL KITCHIN

Defendants

CISCO SYSTEMS, INC.

CBRE GROUP, INC.

JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.,

JONES LANG LASALLE, INC.

JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Sean Kelly

Defendant Attorney

Jacquline M Simonovich

 

Court Documents

Declaration: Interest

1/20/2022 Declaration: Interest

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/20/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/20/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Electronic

2/28/2022 Proof of Service: Electronic

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/28/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.,, JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, LP,; Comment: to Complaint, by Atty. SIMONOVICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.,, JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, LP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: JOANN KITCHIN as the Successor-In-Interest to the ESTATE OF MICHAEL KITCHIN,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOANN KITCHIN as the Successor-In-Interest to the ESTATE OF MICHAEL KITCHIN,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: JOANN KITCHIN as the Successor-In-Interest to the ESTATE OF MICHAEL KITCHIN,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Interest; Filed By: JOANN KITCHIN as the Successor-In-Interest to the ESTATE OF MICHAEL KITCHIN,; Comment: Declaration re successor in interest to the estate of Michael Kitchin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON CONTROLS FIRE PROTECTION, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant