This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:07:34 (UTC).

JLS Environmental Services, Inc. vs AUS Decking, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 JLS Environmental Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AUS Decking, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3883

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JLS Environmental Services, Inc.

Defendants

2112 Monterey Road, L.P.

AUS Decking, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Price, David L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: *C/F 6/23/20 per Court*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: JLS Environmental Services, Inc.; AUS Decking, Inc.; 2112 Monterey Road, L.P.; Comment: Dismissal with prejudice as to entire action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUS Decking Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L Price