This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:23 (UTC).

Jim Angelopoulos vs Balbir Dhillon et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Jim Angelopoulos filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Balbir Dhillon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1823

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelopoulos, Jim

Defendants

Dhillon, Balbir

an entity form of organization unknown

Scrambl'z Kountry Kitchen

Dhillon, Bobby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martinez, Carlos G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Your request for dismissal is incomplete. Please complete Item 1(b).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3rd CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less