This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 12:54:51 (UTC).

Jill Shore vs Luis Santiago-Ramirez et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Jill Shore filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Luis Santiago-Ramirez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Manoukian, Socrates P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9247

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Manoukian, Socrates P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shore, Jill Marie

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Santiago-Ramirez, Luis Martin

Mendoza, Seabastian Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Jordan D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Staples, William H.

Chase, Hal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Manoukian, Socrates P; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150.00 jury fee deposited for Defendant Santiago-Ramirez paid for by Atty Smith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Amended Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty: Staples

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: to Cross-Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: of Mendoza. Atty Chase

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAdvance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150.00 jury fee deposited for Defendant Mendoza paid for by Atty Chase.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Chase

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHASE JR., HAL