This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:28 (UTC).

JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC vs Daniel Partida

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Daniel Partida. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoelker, James L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6106

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Stoelker, James L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC

Defendant

Partida, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McGaffey, David

Mandarich, Christopher D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC; Judgment Amount: $4,557.49; Awarded Against: Partida, Daniel; Party: Names: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC; Partida, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2018
  • Judgment - Comment: $4,557.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Daniel Partida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Declaration of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K

    Read MoreRead Less