This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:29:56 (UTC).

Jacob v. Western Digital Technologies, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Jacob filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Western Digital Technologies, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4446

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jester Jacob

Defendants

Western Digital Technologies, Inc.

Employnet, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry W Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Yoon-Woo Nam

Andrew Marc Paley

Geoffrey Christopher Westbrook

Gary Alan Nye

Trevor Randall Witt

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/17/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/17/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Lawsuit Notice

2/17/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

2/18/2022 Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

Order: Deeming Case Complex

2/22/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order

2/22/2022 Order

Order

2/22/2022 Order

Notice

2/23/2022 Notice

Notice: Related Cases

2/23/2022 Notice: Related Cases

Notice: Appearance

3/4/2022 Notice: Appearance

Acknowledgement/Receipt

3/17/2022 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/17/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice: Appearance

4/6/2022 Notice: Appearance

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appearance; Filed By: Employnet, Inc.,; Comment: Atty Nye *complex fees still required*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appearance; Filed By: Western Digital Technologies, Inc.,; Comment: NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF WESTERN DIGITAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Related Cases; Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: Notice of Related Case (21CV386574)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 6/30/22 to 7/14/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff's CCP 170.6 against Hon. Patricia M. Lucas - signed/PML.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Civil Supervising Judge's Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to D1 SRK after 170.6 against PML - signed/Civil Supervising Judge Sunil R. Kulkarni.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge to the Honorable Patricia M. Lucas Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 170.6; Declaration of Mai Tulyathan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jester Jacob,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jester Jacob,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jester Jacob,; Comment: PAGA Representative Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 6/29/22 at 2:30pm D3

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Employnet, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Digital Technologies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara