This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 08:20:48 (UTC).

Jennifer Mazzuca and Matthew Mazzuca

Case Summary

On 07/01/2014 Jennifer Mazzuca and Matthew Mazzuca was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, Stuart J, Parker, Kimberly and Grilli, Mary Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2820

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, Stuart J

Parker, Kimberly

Grilli, Mary Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Jennifer Mazzuca

Mazzuca, Jennifer

Valles, Jennifer Catalina

Claimant

SUE SAIGN

Defendants and Respondents

Matthew Mazzuca

Mazzuca, Matthew

Minors

Mazzuca, Cole

Mazzuca, Reese

Cole Mazzuca

Reese Mazzuca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell T. Ehrlich

1871 The Alameda, Suite 475

San Jose, CA 95126-1755

Petitioner Attorneys

Matt A Erickson

Pellerin, Jessica A

Claimant Attorney

Bradley R. Chibos

Respondent Attorneys

Phong H Nguyen

Nguyen, Phong H

Minor Attorney

Sue Saign

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 78; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Other w/fee; Department: Department 78; Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 78; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Review; Department: Department 78; Time: 3:15PM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Brief; Filed By: Matthew Mazzuca,; Comment: Respondent's Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Matthew Mazzuca,; Comment: Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 78; Time: 2:00PM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Attorney fees/costs

    Read MoreRead Less
464 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2014
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order : Support; Department: Department 83; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Continued: Future Month

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 08/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Text = petition, summons, rfo... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Child Support; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Text = c/s, s/s Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Support Closed = 04/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Jennifer Mazzuca,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chibos, Bradley R.