Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:06:13 (UTC).

Jennifer Marr vs Joseph Molina

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 Jennifer Marr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Joseph Molina. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Zayner, Theodore C, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1660

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marr, Jennifer

Defendant

Molina, Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mccloskey, Alastair R

Defendant Attorney

Polito, Dominic M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Notice - Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: marr_vs_molina

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to Complaint, atty: Polito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Joseph Molina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Hearing: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: FTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less