This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 11:19:59 (UTC).

Jennifer Laird and Floyd R. Laird

Case Summary

On 02/24/2014 Jennifer Laird and Floyd R Laird was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H and Parker, Kimberly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2093

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Parker, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Laird

Petitioner

Laird, Jennifer

Defendant

Floyd R Laird

Respondent

Laird, Floyd R

Minor

Laird, Samantha R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura A Perry

25 West First Street

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner Attorney

Perry, Laura A

Defendant Attorney

Patrick K. Tillman

2021 The Alameda, Suite 160

San Jose, CA 95126

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Laird, Samantha R; Party: Name: Laird, Floyd R; Party: Name: Laird, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Pretrial Services Report 05-30-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Comment: FJM Truck Repair, INC 401(K)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Comment: IRA-Ledwith Financial Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Original Type: Court Trial: Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated by Court; Comment: Text = Trial, te: 1 Day re: all property issues, set per 9-2-15 mins..sb; Vac. per 10-7-15 mins..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Conference: Settlement - Original Type: Conference: Settlement; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Vacated by Court; Comment: Text = Mandatory, set per 9-2-15 mins..sb; Vac. per 10-7-15 mins..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Court Trial: Short Cause - Original Type: Court Trial: Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated by Court; Comment: Text = (P) tro granted gj.; c/f 6-24-14 mins, ry; c/f 11-5-14 mins, 4hr est.ry; c/f 3-20-15 per DV116, 1st Reiss..sb; Vac. per 10-7-15 mins..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Conference: Settlement - Original Type: Conference: Settlement; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = Mandatory re: CLETS, set per 9-2-15 mins..sb Result By = C Result Judge = PHP - Pennypacker, Philip Result Date = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order: Restraining Order After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL RO After Hrg/CLETS Decision = G Closed = 10/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2014
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = response, uccjea Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 03/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Request for Order (Initial) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = (P) teco gnt, other ( exclusive use of home) Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Other w/fee Closed = 05/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 02-24-14 to 10-07-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 02/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less