This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:15 (UTC).

Jennifer Cruz vs Ernesto Nicho

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Jennifer Cruz filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ernesto Nicho. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Poppe, Matthew, Smith, Irene and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2553

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Poppe, Matthew

Smith, Irene

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz, Jennifer

Defendants

Advance Air Solutions

Nicho, Ernesto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Cruz, Jennifer; Awarded Against: Nicho, Ernesto; Amount; Damages: $6,797.80; Costs: $75.00; Total: $6872.80; Party: Names: Cruz, Jennifer; Nicho, Ernesto

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held; Comment: No POS on OEX as of 2/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Application for order for judgment debtor exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Comment: 10/09/18 Notice of Entry of Judg't.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $75.00. Matter cont'd from 2/27/18 by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Request: Court Order (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Poppe, Matthew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Fees paid $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less