This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:49:04 (UTC).

Jennie Koo vs Brian Choi

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Jennie Koo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brian Choi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3885

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Koo, Jennie

Respondent

Choi, Brian

Minor

Choi, Tae

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dodd, Erik K

Limon, Lou-Anthony P

Respondent Attorneys

Hall Kobesky, Stephanie Julia

Kobesky, Stephanie Hall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Request for Order : Support - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: cs, spousal support, atty fees and costs p/sa

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: reply dec of ptr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: reply dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Comment: for 2/14/19 hrg

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: (P) Petition, Summons, blank Response, UCCJEA, Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Comment: Declaration Re: UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less