Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 09:23:49 (UTC).

Jen Y. Huang and Benjamin Huang

Case Summary

On 02/05/2015 Jen Y Huang and Benjamin Huang was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Towery, James E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4003

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Towery, James E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jen Y Huang

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Petitioner

Huang, Jen Y

Defendant

Benjamin Huang

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Respondent

Huang, Benjamin

Minor

Huang, Ryan Y

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Huang, Jen Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 11/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = fl120, fl105/gc120 Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 02/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Text = petn, summ, blnk response..; personal srvc 2/6/15 @ 11am Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Towery, James E; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 02/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less