This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/20/2023 at 20:38:46 (UTC).

Jeffrey Rocca vs General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Jeffrey Rocca filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8294

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Rocca

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carey B Wood

Vanessa J. Oliva

Defendant Attorney

Mary Arens McBride

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/8/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/8/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/22/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

12/14/2022 Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/17/2023 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service

3/14/2023 Proof of Service

Proof of Service

3/14/2023 Proof of Service

Order

3/14/2023 Order

Request: Action

3/14/2023 Request: Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Action; Comment: Plt filed Peremptory Challenge under 170.6. Is it timely? Challenge is stricken -signed Judge Manoukian.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Striking Peremptory Challenge - signed by Judge Manoukian. *see order for details.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Comment: Request for Action, Order and Order Striking Peremptory Challenge.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: General Motors, LLC,; Comment: to complaint: atty McBride

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jeffrey Rocca,; Comment: Proof of Service Summons (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6; Filed By: Jeffrey Rocca,; Comment: *STRICKEN Per Order filed 03/14/23* Plaintiff's Motion and Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 170.6; Declaration of Vanessa J. Oliva; [Proposed] Order (Motions)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jeffrey Rocca,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jeffrey Rocca,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jeffrey Rocca,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less