This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/20/2022 at 14:15:28 (UTC).

Niemann v. LVNV Funding, LLC (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 Niemann filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against LVNV Funding, LLC Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2583

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey P. Niemann

Defendant

LVNV Funding, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C Salmonsen

Fred W. Schwinn

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/30/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

8/30/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

8/30/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/14/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/15/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jeffrey Niemann,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jeffrey Niemann,; Comment: Class Action Complaint for Statutory Damages + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jeffrey Niemann,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jeffrey Niemann,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 1/19/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara