This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:43:42 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC v. Banda (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Banda Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2100

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants

Law Office of Harris & Zide

Flint Corey Zide

Sarkis Sergo Karayan

Not Yet Classified

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

Angelina Rosalinda Banda

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Kenneth Akira Ohashi

Fred W. Schwinn

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

3/6/2023 Notice

Minute Order

3/2/2023 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/27/2023 Statement: Case Management Conference

Clerk Rejection Letter

2/24/2023 Clerk Rejection Letter

Application: Pro Hac Vice

1/26/2023 Application: Pro Hac Vice

Notice

1/24/2023 Notice

Clerk Rejection Letter

1/24/2023 Clerk Rejection Letter

Application: Pro Hac Vice

1/24/2023 Application: Pro Hac Vice

Document: Other

1/23/2023 Document: Other

Substitution: Attorney

1/20/2023 Substitution: Attorney

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Cross-Complaint: Reclassifies to Unlimited

8/29/2022 Cross-Complaint: Reclassifies to Unlimited

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/11/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order

1/10/2023 Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer: Cross Complaint

9/29/2022 Answer: Cross Complaint

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC set for 6/15/23 at 2:30pm in D1 (Teams)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: HRG 03-02-23 - Joint CMC Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Law Office of Harris & Zide, Flint Zide, Sarkis Karayan,; Comment: Env. 11008528, An additional filing fee of $435 & complex fee of $1000 is still due. Please resubmit the document along w/ the total fee of $4305.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Pro Hac Vice; Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,; Comment: Unopposed Pro Hac Vice Application by Bryan C. Shartle (Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC) and Order Granting Same - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: Cross-Complainant's Notice of Deposit of Complex Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Law Office of Harris & Zide, Flint Zide, Sarkis Karayan,; Comment: Env. 10689862, The required filing fee to submit answer is $1305. Please resubmit document along w/ fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Pro Hac Vice; Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,; Comment: Pro Hac Vice Application by Bradley J. St. Angelo (Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC) and Order Granting Same - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint: Reclassifies to Unlimited; Effective Date: 8/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: Answer to Complaint; Atty: Schwinn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint: Reclassifies to Unlimited; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: Class Action Cross-Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Angelina Banda,; Comment: Summons Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less