Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:04 (UTC).

Jeff Strozza vs FPI Management

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Jeff Strozza filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FPI Management. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Copeland, Christine and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4995

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Copeland, Christine

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strozza, Jeff

Defendant

FPI Management

Not Yet Classified

PMI Management

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (Dismissed in Cjourt without prejudice. No Appearance by the Plt.); Party: Names: Strozza, Jeff; FPI Management; PMI Management

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Order - Comment: Small Claims Order: Post-Judgment w/ POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: on Certified Mail Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70161370000004698275

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Comment: Plaintiffs Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less