This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:51 (UTC).

Jeannine Trott vs Bruce Trott

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Jeannine Trott filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Bruce Trott. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0167

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Trott, Jeannine

Respondents

Troot, Bruce

Trott, Bruce

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Change of Address Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: amended petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: on 1st amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Petition: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Change of Address Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less