This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 04:50:36 (UTC).

Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh vs EYC Acquisition Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against EYC Acquisition Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3136

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh

Defendants

EYC Acquisition Corporation

Symphony Technology Group, LLC

Romesh Wadhwani

Harkamaljit Has Dosanjh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly Anne Wright

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline McIntyre

Richard James Mooney

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/5/2021 Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

10/8/2021 Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order

10/22/2021 Stipulation and Order

Notice

11/16/2021 Notice

Request: Dismissal

11/29/2021 Request: Dismissal

Stipulation and Order

11/29/2021 Stipulation and Order

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/26/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/26/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: The Symphony Defs' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to 1-14-22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Harkamaljit Has Dosanjh,; Comment: 12-14-21 9am dept. 20 Amended Notice re: Motion To Quash for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: The Symphony Defs' deadline to respond to the Complaint shall be extended to 12-1-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: CMC IS CONTINUED TO 4-26-22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Harkamaljit Has Dosanjh,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: EYC Acquisition Corporation, Symphony Technology Group, LLC, Romesh Wadhwani,; Comment: Order Re Time to Respond to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Quash; Filed By: Harkamaljit Has Dosanjh,; Comment: 12-14-21 9am dept.20 Motion To Quash Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Harkamaljit Has Dosanjh,; Comment: of Has Dosanjh in Support of Motion To Quash for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jasvir Kaur Dosanjh,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McIntyre, Caroline

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mooney, Richard