This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:47:34 (UTC).

Jason Oiseth vs Santa Clara Police Dept.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Jason Oiseth filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Santa Clara Police Dept. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5799

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oiseth, Jason Eric

Defendants

Santa Clara Police Dept.

CITY OF SANTA CLARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Heaberlin, Jon A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered (CV, PR); Party: Names: Oiseth, Jason Eric; Santa Clara Police Dept.; Comment: w/prej by Judge Kulkarni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: GRANTING ex parte request for order dismissing case and entering judgment - signed by Judge Kulkarni *see order for details*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: of Saman N. Khan in support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Ex Parte Application - Notice Required - Comment: to dismiss action and for entry of judgment for failure to amend

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice - Comment: re: stay of proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: served Rankin/Stock/Heaberlin/Oneil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Notice of Hearing (no fee) - Comment: Demurrer, Atty Heaberlin, 1/29/19, 9AM, D13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Pro Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant - Comment: By Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice: Related Cases - Comment: 18CV330209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: ***NO SUMMONS ISSUED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less