This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:51:38 (UTC).

Jason Belek vs Chris Lin

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Jason Belek filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Chris Lin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5987

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Belek, Jason

Defendant

Lin, Chris Yen Kuang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hale, Michael Eric

Defendant Attorney

Daley, Michael J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Stipulation and Order: ADR - Comment: Granting ADR Stip for Charles Hawkins to serve as Mediator on 07/31/19 by Judge Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Referral: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Response/Reply - Comment: to OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint, atty Daley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less