Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 06:33:45 (UTC).

Amyx v. Boardwalk Auto Center, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Amyx filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Boardwalk Auto Center, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9043

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amyx, Jason

Defendant

BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Jessica Lynn

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice (Corrected): Comment: (Corrected) 1st CMC set for 7/15/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/29/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Proposed Class Action Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (1st CMC) Proposed Wage and Hour Class Action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 4/6/21, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice (Corrected): Comment: (Corrected) 1st CMC set for 7/15/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 7/29/21 at 2:30pm D1; assigned to Hon. Sunil R. Kulkarni for all purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons: Issued/Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Proposed Class Action Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOARDWALK AUTO CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant