This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 00:29:13 (UTC).

Janelle Gertsch and Chris Gertsch

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 Janelle Gertsch and Chris Gertsch was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin, Pennypacker, Philip H, Huber, Joseph H., Parker, Kimberly and Bernardini, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2264

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

Huber, Joseph H.

Parker, Kimberly

Bernardini, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janelle Gertsch

Petitioners

Gertsch, Janelle

Lerma, Janelle

Defendant

Chris Gertsch

Respondent

Gertsch, Chris

Minors

Gertsch, Andre

Gertsch, Bella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eva M. Martelle

2076 Lincoln Ave

San Jose, CA 95125

Petitioner Attorney

Daprile, Natalie T

Respondent Attorney

McKenzie, Rachael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Gertsch, Janelle; Gertsch, Chris; Gertsch, Andre; Gertsch, Bella

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Request for Order: TRO Mod (with c/c c/v) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: ost granted; teo granted; re: mod of c/c,c/v-lci; C/f 08/14/19 m.o.-sgr;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: POS.Resp.Decl.RFO.mod.cc re 8/14/19 HRg - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Comment: Resp.Decl.RFO.Mod.cc re 8/14/19 Hrg - Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: (r) rfo; teo...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Request for Order: TRO (Mod. incl Custody and/or Visitation) - Comment: ost granted; teo granted; re: mod of c/c,c/v

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = petition, summons, uccjea... Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • Acknowledgement/Receipt - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 07/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 06/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less