This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 23:45:45 (UTC).

JANE DOE vs RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 JANE DOE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3984

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE, JANE

JANE DOE

Defendants

RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

GARVIN, CHRISTOPHER

CHAVEZ, ALBERT J

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC.

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST

ALBERT J CHAVEZ

CHRISTOPHER GARVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bourn, Maria Ann

Maria Ann Bourn

Defendant Attorneys

Tyler Adam Brown

Angelito Remo Sevilla

Spencer Ladd

Brown, Tyler Adam

Kraus, Edward Arthur

Edward Arthur Kraus

 

Court Documents

Review: Mediation Status

5/26/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/26/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/26/2022 Review: Mediation Status

Conference: Trial Setting

10/18/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

10/18/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Minute Order

5/27/2022 Minute Order

Notice

4/20/2022 Notice

Declaration: In Support

3/22/2022 Declaration: In Support

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/24/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/24/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/10/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/10/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/10/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/5/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/11/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

2/8/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 19; Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST, AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC., CHRISTOPHER GARVIN,; Comment: OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Comment: of Michael Brooks Regarding Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: ALBERT CHAVEZ,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST, AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC., CHRISTOPHER GARVIN,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: ALBERT CHAVEZ,; Comment: To Complaint atty: Kraus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: POS Summons Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: RURAL/METRO OF CALIFORNIA, INC., AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE WEST, AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC., CHRISTOPHER GARVIN,; Comment: to Complaint; Atty: Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: POS Summons AMR West

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: POS Summons AMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Comment: POS Summons Rural Metro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: JANE DOE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JANE DOE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: JANE DOE,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rural/Metro of California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOURN, MARIA