This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 15:23:35 (UTC).

Jane Doe vs East Side Union High School District et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Jane Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against East Side Union High School District. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1235

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Doe, Jane

Jane Doe

Defendants

Roe, Jacob

Santa Teresa Children's Center

East Side Union High School District

Roe, Melinda

Santa Teresa High School

Walker, Donna

Donna Walker

Jacob Roe

Melinda Roe

Saundra West

Guardian Ad Litems

Doe, Angela

Doe, Michael

Angela Doe

Michael Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Mezzetti, II, Robert L.

Robert L. Mezzetti, II

Defendant Attorneys

Eric J. Bengtson

Mark E. Davis

Paul Frederick Sherman

 

Court Documents

Conference: Settlement Jury

5/11/2022 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Settlement Jury

5/11/2022 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Settlement Jury

5/11/2022 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Settlement Jury

5/11/2022 Conference: Settlement Jury

Conference: Trial Setting

12/14/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

12/14/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

12/14/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

12/14/2021 Conference: Trial Setting

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/15/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/15/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

7/22/2019 Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

7/22/2019 Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/15/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/15/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/15/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/27/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

12/14/2021 Minute Order

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Department: Department 19; Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Settlement Jury; Department: Department 19; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 19; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Def's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Jane Doe,; Comment: Partial, w/o Prejudice as to Santa Teresa High School & Santa Teresa Children's Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: East Side Union High School District, Donna Walker,; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name & Email Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Pending; Filed By: Jane Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem; Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem; Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jane Doe, Angela Doe, Michael Doe,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where East Side Union High School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bengtson, Eric J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MARK E.