Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 04:17:11 (UTC).

Jameece King vs Carmelita Rogers

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 Jameece King filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Carmelita Rogers. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa, Copeland, Christine, Zayner, Theodore C and Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5244

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Copeland, Christine

Zayner, Theodore C

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Jameece

Defendants

Rogers, Carmelita

Triangle Trailer Park.

Rogers, Carmelita A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: King, Jameece; Awarded Against: Rogers, Carmelita A.; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $75.00; Total: $10075.00; Comment: Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 4/24/17.; Party: Names: King, Jameece; Rogers, Carmelita A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Cont. from 05/20/2019. No POS as of 06/23/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Comment: Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Unsuccessful Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees Waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Comment: on Unsuccessful Service - OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Unsuccessful Service of OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Request - Comment: Iissued Small Claims Subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd by court to this session.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Comment: Mailed 4/24/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Letter dated 8/19/16: ***View Document Return Form for additional details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less