Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:12 (UTC).

Jalecia Olden vs Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Jalecia Olden filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2419

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olden, Jalecia

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Jordan D.

Defendant Attorney

Hamoy-Perera, Aimee Garcia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Comment: Est. 5 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Mediation Hrg. 6-18-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Defendant Target Corporation's Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: No ADR Stip filed by the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 4/11/19 - Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee paid for defendant Target Corporation by Atty Hamoy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty Hamoy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee paid for plaintiff Jalecia Olden by Atty Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less