This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:46:52 (UTC).

Jair Ruiz Uribe et al vs Eppie Lum

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Jair Ruiz Uribe filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Eppie Lum. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, DeLateur, Sandra and Mackin McCarthy, Kristine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5953

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

DeLateur, Sandra

Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ruiz Uribe, Jair Omar

Deng, Dai

Defendant

Lum, Eppie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ruiz Uribe, Jair Omar; Deng, Dai; Awarded Against: Lum, Eppie; Amount; Damages: $280.00; Costs: $30.00; Total: $310.00; Comment: Exhibits are returned to presenting parties with a copy of this judgment.; Party: Names: Ruiz Uribe, Jair Omar; Deng, Dai; Lum, Eppie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: DeLateur, Sandra; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Ruiz Uribe, Jair Omar; Deng, Dai; Judgment Amount: $591.05; Awarded Against: Lum, Eppie; Amount; Damages: $560.00; Costs: $31.05; Total: $591.05; Comment: The Court grants judgment for more than the Plaintiff's Claim demand.; Party: Names: Ruiz Uribe, Jair Omar; Deng, Dai; Lum, Eppie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: MTV Granted, Contined from 01/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Mackin McCarthy, Kristine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion Vacate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Order Vacating/Setting Aside Judgment - Entire Action - Comment: MTV Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Motion to Vacate - Small Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: DeLateur, Sandra; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: FAXED Request to Postpone Trial, FAXED Proof of Service. ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Hrg: 11/20/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less