This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:03:33 (UTC).

Burton v. Johnson & Johnson, et al. [Coordinated into JCCP4872 Los Angeles]

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 Burton filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson, Coordinated into JCCP4872 Los Angeles. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kuhnle, Thomas and Walsh, Brian C. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7496

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kuhnle, Thomas

Walsh, Brian C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Burton, Jacqueline

Individually and as person representative of the Estate of Dorothy Rae Powell

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Other

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zukin, Helen E

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice

Burton Notice of Court Order of Coordination.pdf: Comment: Notice of Court Order Re Coordination of Add-On Cases

Proof of Service

DOC644.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

Notice

Burton Notice of Submission.pdf: Comment: Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872

Order

Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings: Comment: Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings signed/BCW

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW

Summons: Issued/Filed

Burton Summons.pdf: Comment: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Burton Civil Case Cover.pdf: Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Burton Notice of Court Order of Coordination.pdf: Comment: Notice of Court Order Re Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Walsh, Brian C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1st CMC) Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 5/10/18, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - DOC644.pdf: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Burton Notice of Submission.pdf: Comment: Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings: Comment: Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/BCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Burton Summons.pdf: Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Burton Civil Case Cover.pdf: Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies): Comment: Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant