Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/07/2020 at 12:10:18 (UTC).

Jaclyne Soukoulis vs Qeashaun Thompson

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Jaclyne Soukoulis filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Qeashaun Thompson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Overton, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9359

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soukoulis, Jaclyne

Defendant

Thompson, Qeashaun

Other

Pretrial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Muller, Daniel Jerome

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketOrder: Temporary Restraining Order - Comment: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration: In Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest: Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRETRIAL SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Jerome Muller