This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 18:13:14 (UTC).

J. Santos vs W. Neal, et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2014 J Santos filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against W Neal. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, McGowen, Beth, Overton, Carol, Elfving, William J, Strickland, Elizabeth, Pierce, Mark H and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4081

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

McGowen, Beth

Overton, Carol

Elfving, William J

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Julianne Santos

Santos, Julianne

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Walter Eugene Neal, Jr.

Real Estate Ventures, Llc

Lars E. Johnson

Asta E. Johnson

Johnson, Asta E.

Neal, Walter E.

Neal, Walter E., Jr.

Walter Neal, JR

Johnson, Lars E.

Johnson Family Trust 1999 Dated April 30, 1999

Neal, Walter

Neal, Walter Eugene, Jr.

Santos, Julianne

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Johnson, Asta E.

Johnson, Lars E.

Johnson Family Trust 1999 Dated April 30, 1999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Robert R. Rossi

1960 The Alameda, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95126

Rossi, Ronald R.

McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

McDonald Carano Wilson LLP

Woelfel, Jessica

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Woelfel, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: *continued from 8-16-16*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: PARTIAL w/prej as to the Cross-Complaint of W. Neal, Jr. & Real Estate Ventures LLC ONLY (Jessica Woelfel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Original Type: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Defs Real Estate Ventures, LLC, Walter E. Neal, Lars E. Johnson, and the Johnson Family Trust 1999 Dated April 20, 1999 (Jessica Woelfel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Request: Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: request for dismissal entire action: cross-complaint active filed by Real Estate Ventures, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 4/12/16 11am per M/O

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Rossi as to the Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2014
  • Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Ntc of demurrer and demurrer to plt's complaint. 09/02/14 9:00am (Atty Jessica Woelfel) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Demurrer, no fee Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Taken on ntc of demurrer and demurrer to plt's complaint. 09/02/14 9:00am (Atty Jessica Woelfel) Legacy Name = CV First Paper Def - Unltd Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty Jonathan S. O'Donnell Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less