This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 02:33:29 (UTC).

J. Lopez-reyes vs P. Kang, et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2009 J Lopez-reyes filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against P Kang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Madden, James P and Berry, Frank, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6095

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Madden, James P

Berry, Frank, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Juan Carlos Lopez-Reyes

E. Palo Alto, CA 94303

Lopez-reyes, Juan Carlos

Defendants

Ping Q Kang

San Francisco, CA 94121

Ya J Liang

San Francisco, CA 94121

Kang, Ping Q

Liang, Ya J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Liang, Ya J; Party: Name: Kang, Ping Q; Party: Name: Lopez-reyes, Juan Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Liang, Ya J; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kang, Ping Q; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lopez-reyes, Juan Carlos; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Lopez-reyes, Juan Carlos; Judgment Amount: $2,895.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Kang, Ping Q; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $95.00; Other: $2,800.00; Total: $2895.00; Comment: printdate=Apr 28 2009; origjudgdate=Apr 27 2009; judgstatusdate=Apr 28 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Liang, Ya J; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kang, Ping Q; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Lopez-reyes, Juan Carlos; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Satisfaction - Comment: Of Judgment in FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Berry, Frank, Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = FB - Berry, Frank Result Date = 04/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 03/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 04/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less