This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 13:26:27 (UTC).

J. Kucera vs M. Mercik, et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2011 J Kucera filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Mercik. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fan, Esther and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8070

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fan, Esther

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judy Kucera

San Jose, CA 95128

Kucera, Judy

Defendants

Michael Mercik

Los Gatos, CA 95032

Julie Mercik

Los Gatos, CA 95032

Mercik, Michael

Mercik, Julie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Mercik, Julie; Party: Name: Mercik, Michael; Party: Name: Kucera, Judy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Mercik, Julie; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kucera, Judy; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Kucera, Judy; Judgment Amount: $5,170.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Mercik, Julie; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $170.00; Other: $5,000.00; Total: $5170.00; Comment: printdate=Aug 19 2011; origjudgdate=Aug 18 2011; judgstatusdate=Aug 19 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCPI;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Mercik, Julie; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mercik, Michael; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kucera, Judy; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Fan, Esther; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Fan, Esther; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = D Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/20/2011 Log Note Text = {EvtCD=SC01; Jdg=267; HdrDtm=2011/07/28 1356pm; Notes=none; },

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 06/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 07/27/2011

    Read MoreRead Less