This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/12/2022 at 18:46:11 (UTC).

J. Garcia vs V. Dang

Case Summary

On 07/03/2008 J Garcia filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against V Dang. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************9354

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Garcia

Defendant

Vickie T Dang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case Purged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 22; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Jose Garcia, Vickie Dang,; Comment: Text = jose garcia to recover from vickie dang for a total of $0. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 11/05/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 10/06/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Vickie Dang,; Comment: Text = defendants appeal of the 8/28/08 small claims judgment Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Comment: Text = Judgment for plaintiff against defendant $300.00 plus $40 costs Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 58; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Jose Garcia, Vickie Dang,; Comment: Text = cert mail Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less; Filed By: Jose Garcia,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less