This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 21:02:42 (UTC).

J. Chavez vs Robson Homes, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2014 J Chavez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Robson Homes, LLC,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2354

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesus Chavez

Claimant

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Cross Plaintiffs

Robson Homes, Llc

Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California

Peggy S. Lane, Inc.

Cross Defendant

B & D Plumbing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia E Walsh

Kevin Patrick McCarthy

Cross Defendant Attorney

Kevin P. Cody

Other Attorneys

Catherine B. Alston

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

10/24/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

10/24/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

10/24/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

10/24/2017 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

2/20/2018 Conference: Trial Setting

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

4/4/2018 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Request: Dismissal

4/2/2018 Request: Dismissal

Request: Dismissal

3/27/2018 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

2/20/2018 Minute Order

Minute Order

10/24/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/29/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/29/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/29/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/28/2017 Minute Order

Minute Order

7/26/2017 Minute Order

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Sun Lakes Construction Company of California, Robson Homes, LLC,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Peggy S. Lane, Inc.,; Comment: Partial: Cross-Complaint of Peggy S. Lane Inc. Without Prejudice (Kevin P. McCarthey)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,; Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Cross-Complaint filed by Robson Homes and Sun Lakes Construction only.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 13; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 13; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Peggy S. Lane, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2015
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,; Comment: atty walsh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Jesus Chavez,; Comment: by atty Daniel Pocklington

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: General Denial: Unlimited; Filed By: Jesus Chavez, Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 13; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jesus Chavez,; Comment: party served (#3) is blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Jesus Chavez,; Comment: atty Pocklington

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jesus Chavez, Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jesus Chavez, Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jesus Chavez, Robson Homes, LLC, Sun Lakes Construction Company Of California,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less