This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/19/2018 at 23:13:07 (UTC).

J. Chan vs C. Myer

Case Summary

On 08/27/2014 J Chan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C Myer. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Smith, Irene, Steingart, Lisa and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0352

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Smith, Irene

Steingart, Lisa

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Chan

Saratoga, CA 95070

Chan, John

Defendants

Catarina Myer

Sebastopol, CA 95472

Myer, Catarina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Myer, Catarina; Party: Name: Chan, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Myer, Catarina; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Chan, John; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Myer, Catarina; Awarded Against: Chan, John; Comment: clerkid=572; printdate=Dec 2 2014; freetext=Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. Defendant must re-issue security deposit check by 12/15/14. If check is not issued, Plaintiff shall set a motion to enforce in front of pro tem Irene Smith.; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Dec 1 2014; judgstatusdate=Dec 2 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Myer, Catarina; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Chan, John; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge Irene Smith Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Gregory Garrity Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Comment: Text = Judgment: Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. Defendant must re-issue security deposit check by 12/15/14. If check is not issued, Plaintiff shall set a motion to enforce in front of pro tem Irene Smith. by pro tem Irene Smith Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = IS - Smith, Irene Result Date = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 09/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 08/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 09/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less