This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 03:26:07 (UTC).

J. Bramlett vs Oracle Marketing, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2011 J Bramlett filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Oracle Marketing, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yew, Erica and Madden, James P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8379

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yew, Erica

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bramlett, Judy L

Defendant

Green, Chana E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2012
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Order on Req Payments Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Response/Reply - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Resp to Req Make Payments Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Request - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req to Make Payments Decision = M Closed = 09/14/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • Other - Judicial Officer: Yew, Erica; Comment: Text = Motion for Reconsideration: Def's Mtn for Reconsideration is DENIED. The motion is untimely, even providing for ten days mailing of the order to a location outside the state of California. In addition, new facts have not been sufficiently raised. Def had multiple opportunities to present their case and evidence in Small Claims Court and twice before the Superior Court. It is so ordered. Judge Yew Legacy Name = SC Other Decision = D Closed = 08/16/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = w/ntc returned to Palo Alto Small Claims Court Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 07/23/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: J. Bramlett vs Oracle Marketing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Yew, Erica; Comment: Text = PLT Bramlett shall recover from DEF Oracle Marketing, Inc $4,470.00 PLUS $120.00 in costs for a total jmt of $4,590.00. Judge Yew Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = R Closed = 07/23/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Yew, Erica; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Text = 1st cnt from 5-25-12 per Judge Yew Result By = C Result Judge = EY - Yew, Erica Result Date = 06/29/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 05/31/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2012
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = D Result Date = 02/01/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: vacated; reset future month; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 12/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 11/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Certified Mail Returned to Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 12/27/2011

    Read MoreRead Less