This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/12/2022 at 12:41:52 (UTC).

J. Ackerman, et al vs San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2008 J Ackerman filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against San Carlos Willard Associates, L P . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cabrinha, Neal A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4187

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cabrinha, Neal A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joseph G Ackerman

Rita M Ackerman

Ackerman, Joseph G

Ackerman, Rita M

Defendants

San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P.

David Neale

Roem Builders, Inc.

Roem Builders

Roem Development Corp.

San Carlos Town Homes, Llc

Core Development, Inc.

Roem Sc, Llc

Aof/Pacific Affordable Housing Corp.

Neale, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bernd W. Schmidt

2065 Benson Avenue

Santa Cruz, CA 95065-1682

Schmidt, Bernd W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2008
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2008
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P., David Neale, Roem Builders, Inc., Roem Builders, Roem Development Corp., San Carlos Town Homes, LLC, Core Development, Inc., Roem SC, LLC, AOF/Pacific Affordable Housing Corp.,; Comment: Text = by Atty Schmidt Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Town Homes, LLC,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/28/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2008
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amendment To (New Party); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman,; Comment: Text = naming doe 1 as san carlos town homes, llc; doe 2 as core development, inc.; doe 3 as roem sc, llc; doe 4 as aof/pacific affordable housing corp. Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/25/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, Roem Builders, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, Roem Builders,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P., David Neale, Roem Builders, Inc., Roem Builders, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P., David Neale, Roem Builders, Inc., Roem Builders, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Text = Bernd W. Schmidt Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Joseph Ackerman, Rita Ackerman, San Carlos Willard Associates, L.P., David Neale, Roem Builders, Inc., Roem Builders, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/05/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Core Development, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant