This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:25 (UTC).

Irma Kouza et al vs Patrick Knowles et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Irma Kouza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Patrick Knowles. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6105

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kouza, Irma

Sanosyan, Ervand

Defendants

Roye, Jennifer A.

Knowles, Patrick Kevin

Does I-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Armendariz, Geraldine

Defendant Attorneys

Sell, James Egan

O'Yang, Cory L

Wulterin, Shayne Lawrence

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: C/F 4-16-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint Atty: Silverstein

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Declaration of Cory L. O'Yang Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 435.5 for Automatic Extension

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: taken on Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended; Atty Armendariz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Jennifer Roye

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Patrick Knowles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less