This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 15:44:19 (UTC).

INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company vs ALLISON BETTENCOURT et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLISON BETTENCOURT. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0652

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company

Defendants

ALLISON BETTENCOURT

JUSTIN W. BETTENCOURT

JOHN X. BETTERNCOURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan Joseph Brown

Jill Ray Glennon

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/30/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/30/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/18/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/18/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/30/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/30/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/18/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

5/18/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 16; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company,; Comment: INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER (Case Initiation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company,; Comment: No Civil Lawsuit Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: INVESTORS LIFE INSURANCE OF NORTH AMERICA, an insurance company,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investors Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Ray Glennon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ETHAN