This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 03:47:15 (UTC).

Investment Retrievers,Inc. Vs E. Clements

Case Summary

On 10/07/2014 Investment Retrievers,Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against E Clements. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1605

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xxx

Susan Garner

Investment Retrievers,Inc.

Defendants

Clyde Stiteler

Hanne B Olofsen

Daniel Holloway

Sarah Holloway

Stephen Guzzetti

Stitegarnmac,Llc

Mission Way Partners,Llc

Sardan,Llc

Hbo,Llc

Victoria Mcelroy

Terry Mcelroy

Edward Clements

Clements, Ed

Clements, Edward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Fletterick

4354 Town Center Blvd, Suite 114 #106

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762

Carvo, Daniel John

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Investment Retrievers,Inc.; Awarded Against: Clements, Edward; Amount; Damages: $74,205.69; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $35,252.78; Attorney Fees: $3,084.11; Costs: $1,015.00; Total: $113557.58; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Investment Retrievers,Inc.; Judgment Amount: $74,205.69; And Attorney Fees: $1,015.00; Awarded Against: Clements, Edward; Amount; Damages: $74,205.69; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $35,252.78; Attorney Fees: $3,084.11; Costs: $1,015.00; Total: $113557.58; Party: Name: Investment Retrievers,Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: A Writ of Execution for El Dorado County was issued on 7/1/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Comment: Against: Edward Clements aka Ed Clements Individually and dba Edwards Clements - El Dorado $114,174.67

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs - Comment: INTEREST: $591.09; DATE: 02-16-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Clerk Default Judgment (CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Text = Re: Default *Cont from 9-24-15*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Declaration: CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Dismissal - Comment: as to does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = old: Grevious new: Carvo Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = re Old: Atty Loria Grevious New: Atty Daniel Carvo Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 05/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Original Type: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = OSC FTA is vacated. FTA and FTS - NSA/NTA - Plaintiff's failure to appear may result in dismissal of the case. Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 03/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Set for: OSC/Dismissal; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = ES7 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 02/10/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 10/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less