This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:51:54 (UTC).

Integrigen, Inc. et al vs Lee Leonard et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Integrigen, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Lee Leonard. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Rudy, Christopher G and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5991

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Rudy, Christopher G

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Allied Financial Strategies

Integrigen, Inc.

PHD

Kirk Trisler, MD PHD

Leonard, Lee

James Larrick, MD PhD

Fabrus, Inc.

Vaughn Smider, MD, PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salama, Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Comment: Demurrer is SUSTAINED and request that the order dismiss all of the causes of action recited in complaint w/prejudice and w/out leave to amend is GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to the Complaint by Defs. Smider, Larrick, Trisler, and Integrigen Inc. (Dan Lawton) **C/F 5-14-19 hrg set per stip and order filed on 5-24-19**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: to Cont. Demurrer on Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: No Special or Telephonic Appearance for Plt's Counsel Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: to the Complaint by Defs. Smider, Larrick, Trisler, and Integrigen Inc. (Dan Lawton)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: re: in response to order to show cause

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2019
  • Proof of Service: Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Demurrer - Comment: 05/14/2019, 9:00 AM, dept 19, atty: Lawton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: HRG 5-14-19 Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: #2556792 - The document requires a $1740 filing fee. Defendants have not paid first paper fees. $435 first paper fee is requires for each defendant the demurrer is being submitted for.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less