This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 02:16:05 (UTC).

INSUL-FLOW, INC. vs MILPITAS DISTRICT 1 ASSOCIATES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 INSUL-FLOW, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MILPITAS DISTRICT 1 ASSOCIATES LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Barrett, Thang N and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3956

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Barrett, Thang N

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSUL-FLOW, INC.

Defendants

DEACON CORPORATION

MILPITAS DISTRICT 1 ASSOCIATES LLC

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilkins, James Hugh

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement: Comment: Insul-Flow Inc.'s Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: C/F 10-27-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 04/13/2021 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Case Management Statement: Comment: Insul-Flow Inc.'s Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Deacon Corporation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (International Fidelity Ins. Co.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons (Milpitas District)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: First Amended, atty Wilkins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint on Milpitas District 1 Associates LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice: Reassignment of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice: Reassignment of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSUL-FLOW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deacon Corp., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilkins, James H.