This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:27:45 (UTC).

In the Matter of Laila Al-Shamma

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 In the Matter of Laila Al-Shamma was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pichon, Rise Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1812

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pichon, Rise Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Al-Shamma, Laila

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Order - Comment: In RE: Name and Gender Change and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Hearing: OSC Name/Gender Change - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause: Name/Gender Change - Comment: hrg 4/17/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Name/Gender Change - Comment: $435 waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less